EP0902573 - Line receiver with galvanic isolation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2001/41] |
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moyal, Michael Peschelanger 12 81735 München / DE | [1999/11] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98116121.9 | 26.08.1998 | [1999/11] | Priority number, date | DE19971039960 | 11.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19739960 | [1999/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0902573 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0902573 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
H04L25/0266 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2002/26] |
Former [1999/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Leitungsempfänger mit galavanischer Trennung | [1999/11] | English: | Line receiver with galvanic isolation | [1999/11] | French: | Recépteur de ligne à isolation galvanique | [1999/11] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/15] | 15.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.05.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.05.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB1529043 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD) [X] 1 * page 1, column 1, line 10 - column 2, line 55 * * page 1, column 2, line 70 - line 80; claim 1 * [Y] 2-11; | [Y]JPH08204470 ; | [X]US3838224 (RICHARDS L) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 9 - line 14 * * column 1, line 48 - line 61 * * column 12, line 16 - line 40 *; | [XA]US3550007 (SCHMITT HERBERT R) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-11; | [A]US5287070 (THELEN BOB [US], et al) [A] 2-11 * figure 2; claim 1 * * column 1, line 18 - line 33 *; | [A]GB2293739 (SONY UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 9 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, & JP08204470 A 19960809 (NEC CORP) [Y] 2-11 * abstract * |