EP0899638 - Control system for plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasui, Yuji c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd., 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Hasegawa, Yusuke c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd., 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Iwaki, Yoshihisa c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd., 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Kitagawa, Hiroshi c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd., 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 05 /
Akazaki, Shusuke c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd., 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1999/09] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98116160.7 | 27.08.1998 | [1999/09] | Priority number, date | JP19970247519 | 29.08.1997 Original published format: JP 24751997 | [1999/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0899638 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0899638 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | [1999/31] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0899638 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0899638 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G05B13/02, F02D41/14, G05B13/04 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
G05B13/042 (EP,US);
F02D41/1402 (EP,US);
F02D41/1456 (EP,US);
F02D41/2454 (EP,US);
F02D41/2477 (EP,US);
F02D2041/1415 (EP,US);
F02D2041/1418 (EP,US);
F02D2041/143 (EP,US);
F02D2041/1433 (EP,US);
F02D41/2483 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/09] | G05B13/02, F02D41/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/15] |
Former [1999/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Regelungssystem für Anlagen | [1999/09] | English: | Control system for plants | [1999/09] | French: | Système de régulation pour une installation | [1999/09] | Examination procedure | 05.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 09.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5636621 (MAKI HIDETAKA [JP], et al) [DA] 1,8 * column W *; | [A]EP0312835 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5209214 (IKUTA KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US5243952 (IKUTA KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A] - K.BURNHAM ET AL, "SELF-TUNING CONTROL FOR A CLASS OF MISO BILINEAR SYSTEMS", 5TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEMS ENGINEERING, USA, (19870909), pages 261 - 271, XP002102868 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - L.HAU ET AL, "ADAPTIVE CONTROL WITH DISCONTINUOUS FORGETTING FACTOR AND SATURATION FOR IMPROVED ROBUSTNESS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1986 AMERICAN CONTROL CONFERENCE, USA, (19860618), vol. 2, pages 1075 - 1080, XP002102869 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - V.ETXEBARRIA, "ADAPTIVE CONTROL WITH A FORGETTING FACTOR WITH MULTIPLE SAMPLES BETWEEN PARAMETER ADJUSTMENTS", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CONTROL, UK, (199205), vol. 55, no. 5, pages 1189 - 1200, XP002103005 [A] 1 * the whole document * |