EP0920041 - Switching insert for rotary switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Preh GmbH An der Stadthalle 97616 Bad Neustadt a.d. Saale / DE | [2004/24] |
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states Preh-Werke GmbH & Co. KG An der Stadthalle 97616 Bad Neustadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Karl-Heinz Lerchenstrasse 9 97616 Bad Neustadt / DE | 02 /
Kirchner, Thilo Steinbergstrasse 19 97705 Burkardroth / DE | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Dietrich, Barbara, et al Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Derendorfer Allee 6 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Dietrich, Barbara, et al Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2000/43] | Dietrich, Barbara, et al Rheinmetall AG Zentrale Patentabteilung Postfach 10 42 61 40033 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1999/41] | Pfeiffer, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. c/o Rheinmetall Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung Rheinmetall Allee 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1999/22] | Pfeiffer, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Pierburg GmbH, Zentrale Patentabteilung, Kennedydamm 17, (Rheinmetall Gebäude) 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 98116249.8 | 28.08.1998 | [1999/22] | Priority number, date | DE19971053079 | 29.11.1997 Original published format: DE 19753079 | [1999/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0920041 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0920041 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | [2000/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0920041 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01H19/10, H01H19/58, H01H1/36 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
H01H19/58 (EP,US);
H01H1/365 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/22] | H01H19/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/03] |
Former [1999/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schaltereinsatz für Drehschalter | [1999/22] | English: | Switching insert for rotary switch | [1999/22] | French: | Elément commutateur à insérer pour interrupteur rotatif | [1999/22] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 02.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 20.04.2005 | GB | 20.04.2005 | IT | 20.04.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | GB | 20.04.2005 | |
IT | 20.04.2005 | ||
FR | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2008/12] | GB | 20.04.2005 | |
IT | 20.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | GB | 20.04.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2008453 (STACKPOLE CARBON CO) [A] 1 * page 7, paragraph 3; figure 15 *; | [A]GB2043347 (BUN WONG) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]DE489822 (VOIGT & HAEFFNER AG) [DA] 1 * column 1, paragraph L - column 2, paragraph 1; figure 2 *; | [A]US3501598 (LIS THEODORE M) [A] 1 * column 2, line 31 - line 39; figure 2 *; | [DA]DE2824584 (EBE ELEKTRO BAU ELEMENTE GMBH) |