EP0901199 - Holding assembly for mounting electrical connectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/10] | Frame structure for mounting an electrical connector | ||
[2004/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle, Illinois 60532 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle Illinois 60532 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pill, Anthony J. 530 Michigan Avenue Aurora, IL 60506 / US | [1999/10] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1999/10] | Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 98116403.1 | 29.08.1998 | [1999/10] | Priority number, date | US19970924854 | 05.09.1997 Original published format: US 924854 | [1999/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0901199 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0901199 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | [2000/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0901199 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/74 | [1999/10] | CPC: |
H01R13/516 (EP,US);
H01R13/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/21] |
Former [1999/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Haltevorrichtung zum Montieren elektrischer Verbinder | [2004/01] | English: | Holding assembly for mounting electrical connectors | [2004/01] | French: | Dispositif de support pour monter des connecteurs électriques | [2004/01] |
Former [1999/10] | Rahmenstruktur zum Montieren eines elektrischen Verbinders | ||
Former [1999/10] | Frame structure for mounting an electrical connector | ||
Former [1999/10] | Structure de support pour monter un connecteur électrique | Examination procedure | 24.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 17.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 12.05.2004 | IT | 12.05.2004 | [2008/12] |
Former [2006/32] | FR | 12.05.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4436361 (MCCLEEREY EARL W [US]) [X] 1-4,8-12 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 38; figure - * * figure - * [Y] 5-7; | [Y]US4923408 (ZINN BERND [DE]) [Y] 5-7 * column 3, line 30 - line 50; figure 10 *; | [Y]DE8904564U (SIEMENS AG) [Y] 7 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 35; figures 1,3 *; | [A]GB2292266 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,6,8,9,11* figure 9 * |