Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] |
15.02.2003 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] |
29.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
09.10.2002 | Renewal fee | |
02.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
10.10.2001 | Renewal fee | |
11.10.2000 | Renewal fee | |
25.04.2000 | Change - extension states | |
25.02.2000 | Definitive list of designations | published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] |
18.06.1999 | Publication of search report | published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] |
15.01.1999 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.03.1999 [1999/09] |
15.01.1999 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.03.1999 [1999/09] |