EP0894687 - Hydraulic actuating system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS FRANCE S.A. 43 avenue du Gros-Chêne 95520 Herblay-Cergy-Pontoise / FR | [1999/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tobiasz, Andre 43, Allee Rude 93800 Epinay-sur-Seine / FR | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Roger Automotive Products Group Ltd. Patent Department P.O. Box 2085 Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa, Warwickshire, CV31 3ZL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Morrall, Roger Automotive Products plc Patent Department Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa, Warwickshire, CV31 3ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 98116504.6 | 15.03.1995 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | GB19940005124 | 16.03.1994 Original published format: GB 9405124 | [1999/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0894687 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0894687 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60T11/16, B60T11/236, F16D25/12, B60T11/22 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
F16D25/088 (EP);
B60T11/16 (EP,KR);
B60T11/22 (EP);
B60T11/236 (EP,KR);
F16D25/08 (EP);
F16D25/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/05] | Title | German: | Hydraulische Betätigungseinrichtung | [1999/05] | English: | Hydraulic actuating system | [1999/05] | French: | Système d'actionnement hydraulique | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 03.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 10.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 18.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95913126.9 / EP0697972 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Request for further processing for: | 31.10.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.11.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.06.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.06.2003 | [2004/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9215474 (AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS PLC [GB]) [X] 1,7,8 * page 3, line 17 - page 6, line 18; figures 1-3 * [Y] 9; | [Y]FR2686659 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD FRANCE [FR]) [Y] 9 * page 6, line 2 - page 12, line 13; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE3816608 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0146283 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD PLC [GB]) [A] 1,10-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8703344 (AUSTRALIA BRAKE & CLUTCH IND [AU]) | by applicant | US4488701 | GB2195729 | WO9525028 |