EP0902537 - Circuit arrangement for limiting excessive voltages in power semiconductors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bruckmann, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Am Bächlein 3 90475 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Eckel, Hans-Günter, Dr. Badstrasse 41 91052 Erlangen / DE | [1999/11] | Application number, filing date | 98116595.4 | 02.09.1998 | [1999/11] | Priority number, date | DE1997140540 | 15.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19740540 | [1999/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0902537 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0902537 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | [2000/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/082 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
H03K17/0406 (EP);
H03K17/0828 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2001/29] |
Former [1999/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Begrenzung von Überspannungen bei Leistungshalbleitern | [1999/11] | English: | Circuit arrangement for limiting excessive voltages in power semiconductors | [1999/11] | French: | Montage servant à limiter les surtensions pour semi-conducteurs de puissance | [1999/11] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/02] | 20.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0523800 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD ;KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV (NL)) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,11 * column 6, line 3 - column 9, line 33 * * column 13, line 5 - column 14, line 50; figures 1,4 * [Y] 6,10,12,13; | [Y]EP0321663 (LENZE GMBH & CO KG AERZEN) [Y] 6 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 55; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9627230 (ABB RESEARCH LTD ;BIJLENGA BO (SE)) [Y] 10 * page 17, line 16 - line 23; figure 13 *; | [A]EP0730331 (KIEPE BAHN ELEKTRIK GMBH) [A] 1 * column 5, line 16 - line 31; figure 1 * | [Y] - RAHUL CHOKHAWALA ET AL, "A DISCUSSION ON IGBT SHORT CIRCUIT BEHAVIOR AND FAULT PROTECTION SCHEMES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION (APEC),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19930307), vol. CONF. 8, ISBN 0-7803-0983-9, pages 393 - 401, XP000357921 [Y] 12 * figure 5 * | [Y] - WHEELER P W ET AL, "AN INVESTIGATION OF THE TURN-OFF CHARACTERISTICS OF AN IGBT UNDER SHORT CIRCUIT CONDITIONS", EPE. EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON POWER ELECTRONICS AND APPLICATIONS,B,BRUSSELS, EPE ASSOCIATION, (19970908), vol. CONF. 7, ISBN 90-75815-02-6, pages 4029 - 4033, XP000768128 [Y] 13 * page 4029, column R, line 11 - line 17; figure 1C * |