EP0909834 - Foil transporting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leybold Systems GmbH Wilhelm-Rohn-Strasse 25 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/16] | For all designated states Leybold Systems GmbH Wilhelm-Rohn-Strasse 25 D-63450 Hanau am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winter, Erwin Eppsteinstrasse 48 63456 Hanau / DE | 02 /
Schwarz, Wolfgang, Dr. Krummwiese 4 63589 Linsengericht / DE | 03 /
Schönherr, Bernhard Jagdhaus Schwobach 35647 Waldsolms / DE | 04 /
Wenk, Karl-Heinrich Am Promenadenweg 3A 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [1999/16] | Application number, filing date | 98116742.2 | 04.09.1998 | [1999/16] | Priority number, date | DE1997139833 | 11.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19739833 | [1999/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0909834 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0909834 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | [1999/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/56, B65H23/00, B65H20/00 | [1999/16] | CPC: |
C23C14/541 (EP);
B65H23/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2000/04] |
Former [1999/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Folientransportvorrichtung | [1999/16] | English: | Foil transporting device | [1999/16] | French: | Dispositif pour transport des feuilles | [1999/16] | Examination procedure | 15.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 27.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/21] | 21.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5252135 (MURAKAMI KOJI) [A] 1-15 * column W *; | [A]JPS61119673 ; | [A]US5016801 (GILAT RONEN ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861022), vol. 010, no. 310, Database accession no. (C - 379), & JP61119673 A 19860606 (ANELVA CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |