EP0913102 - Sole for sportsshoe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salomon S.A. La Ravoire 74370 Metz-Tessy / FR | [1999/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Girard, François 8 bis, route de Menthon 74290 Veyrier du Lac / FR | 02 /
Girault, Eric 320, chemin des Boubioz 74320 Sevrier / FR | [1999/18] | Application number, filing date | 98116924.6 | 08.09.1998 | [1999/18] | Priority number, date | FR19970013749 | 29.10.1997 Original published format: FR 9713749 | [1999/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0913102 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0913102 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/04, A63C9/20 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
A63C9/20 (EP);
A43B5/0411 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FI, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/03] |
Former [1999/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sohle für Sportschuh | [2003/17] | English: | Sole for sportsshoe | [1999/18] | French: | Semelle de chaussure de sport | [1999/18] |
Former [1999/18] | Sohle fuer sportschuh | Examination procedure | 21.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 29.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 07.01.2004 | [2006/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2739788 (SALOMON SA [FR]) [AD] 1* the whole document * | Examination | WO9409660 | by applicant | FR2739788 |