blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0903849

EP0903849 - Audio level compression circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.04.2003  [2003/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/15]For all designated states
Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd.
5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP
Former [1999/12]For all designated states
SANYO ELECTRIC Co., Ltd.
5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Imai, Katsumi
198-1, Ryumai-cho
Ota-City, Gunma / JP
[1999/12]
Representative(s)Harrison, Michael Charles, et al
Albihns GmbH, Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/12]Harrison, Michael Charles, et al
Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date98117245.511.09.1998
[1999/12]
Priority number, dateJP1997025358818.09.1997         Original published format: JP 25358897
[1999/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0903849
Date:24.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0903849
Date:16.02.2000
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0903849
Date:10.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:H03G7/08
[1999/12]
CPC:
H03G7/08 (EP,KR,US); H03F3/45094 (KR)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/43]
Former [1999/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Audiopegel-Kompressionsschaltung[1999/12]
English:Audio level compression circuit[1999/12]
French:Circuit compresseur du niveau audio[1999/12]
Examination procedure25.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
28.12.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2001Fee for grant paid
02.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200104   M06   Fee paid on   22.01.2002
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4550426  (GILLIG STEVEN F [US], et al) [A] 1,4,7,10 * column A *;
 [A]US4506113  (BLOMLEY PETER F [GB]) [A] 1,4,7,10;
 [A]JPH0794987  ;
 [A]US4319205  (SCHOLZ WERNER) [A] 1,4,7,10 * column A *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 1995, no. 07, & JP07094987 A 19950407 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,4,7,10 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.