EP0903367 - Heterogeneous silica carbon black-filled rubber compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corvasce, Filomeno Gennaro 14A Rue Wechen 9167 Mertzig / LU | 02 /
Agostini, Giorgio (nmn) 7, Rue de Luxembourg 7733 Colmar-Berg / LU | 03 /
Dauvister, Pierre Marie Jean 15, Rue G Kurth 6700 Arlon / BE | [1999/12] | Representative(s) | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | ||
Former [1999/12] | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg Patent-Department L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 98117249.7 | 11.09.1998 | [1999/12] | Priority number, date | US19970059671P | 18.09.1997 Original published format: US 59671 P | [1999/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0903367 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/22, C08K3/36, C08K3/04, C08L21/00 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
C08J3/226 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08J2321/00 (EP,US);
C08J2421/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08K3/36, C08L21/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/49] |
Former [1999/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Heterogene, mit Siliziumdioxid und Russ gefüllte Gummizusammensetzung | [1999/12] | English: | Heterogeneous silica carbon black-filled rubber compound | [1999/12] | French: | Compositions caoutchouteuses hétérogènes chargées de silice et de noir de carbone | [1999/12] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 09.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/35] | 25.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0763558 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [Y] 1-13 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0791622 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [Y] 1-13* abstract * |