EP0902547 - Improved power supply system for a packet-switched radio transmitter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carkner, Steve 203 Beaver Creek Road Waterloo, Ontario, N2T 2R8 / CA | 02 /
Lowles, Robert 1374 Lydia Street Cambridge, Ontario, N3H 1B1 / CA | 03 /
Schaaff, Carl 17 Carey Cres Guelph, Ontario, N1H 7J9 / CA | 04 /
Nickerson, Kent 386 Vogel Place Waterloo, Ontario, N2L 5V8 / CA | [1999/19] |
Former [1999/11] | 01 /
Carkner, Steve 504b Lonelm City Waterloo, Ontario, N2L 5E1 / CA | ||
02 /
Lowles, Robert 1374 Lydia Street Cambridge, Ontario, N3H 1B1 / CA | |||
03 /
Schaaff, Carl 17 Carey Cres Guelph, Ontario, N1H 7J9 / CA | |||
04 /
Nickerson, Kent 386 Vogel Place Waterloo, Ontario, N2L 5V8 / CA | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Baaderstraße 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Schmit Chretien Schihin & Mahler Baaderstraße 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/13] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte, Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/26] | Ricker, Mathias, Dr. Jones Day, Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte, Prinzregentenstrasse 56 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/11] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte, Kindermann Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 98117379.2 | 14.09.1998 | [1999/11] | Priority number, date | US19970929616 | 15.09.1997 Original published format: US 929616 | [1999/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0902547 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0902547 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | [2001/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0902547 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/06, H04B1/56, H04B1/38, H02J7/00 | [2001/25] | CPC: |
H04B1/1607 (EP,US);
H04B1/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/11] | H04B1/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [2002/11] |
Former [1999/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stromversorgungssystem für paketvermittelten Radiosender | [1999/11] | English: | Improved power supply system for a packet-switched radio transmitter | [1999/11] | French: | Système d'alimentation de puissance amélioré pour un émetteur radio à commutation par paquets | [1999/11] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/11] | 05.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 01.08.2007 | SE | 01.11.2007 | [2008/28] |
Former [2008/12] | NL | 01.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5187640 (METROKA MICHAEL P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,10-13,16,25,26,28,33-36,38,39 * column 5, line 15 - column 6, line 30; figures 2-4 * [A] 4,5,7-9,14,15,17-24,27,29-32,37; | [XA]US5587250 (THOMAS GEORGE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,10-13,16,33-36,38,39 * column 3, line 39 - column 5, line 27; figures 1,3 * [A] 3-5,7-9,14,17-32,37; | [XA]US5591212 (KEIMEL JOHN G [US]) [X] 1,6,10,17-20,36-38 * column 4, line 25 - line 49 * [A] 2,3,12,21,22; | [XA]US5229649 (NIELSEN WYN Y [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9 * column 14, line 33 - line 60; figure 4B * [A] 5; | [A]WO9429968 (MITSUI COMTEK CORP [US]) [A] 1,6,14,15,29,30 * abstract * |