EP0905864 - Process for the consolidation of the coil windings for electric machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Senger, Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) In der Wend 13 91257 Pegnitz / DE | [1999/13] | Application number, filing date | 98117384.2 | 14.09.1998 | [1999/13] | Priority number, date | DE1997142427 | 25.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19742427 | [1999/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0905864 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0905864 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | [2000/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0905864 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/12 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
H02K15/12 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53883 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2001/06] |
Former [1999/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verfestigung von Wicklungsspulen elektrischer Maschinen | [1999/13] | English: | Process for the consolidation of the coil windings for electric machines | [1999/13] | French: | Procédé de consolidation des enroulements pour machines électriques | [1999/13] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 22.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.03.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 24.11.2004 | [2006/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62126844 ; | [X]US4152103 (NAPIERSKI REINHARD H [DE]) [X] 1,4-10 * column 1, line 51 - line 57 * * column 3, line 20 - line 24 * * claim 5 *; | [X]EP0070661 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8,10 * page 12, line 7 - line 9 * * page 12, line 25 - line 30 * * page 13, line 3 - line 7 * * page 14, line 1 - line 6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871112), vol. 011, no. 346, Database accession no. (E - 556), & JP62126844 A 19870609 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 3 * abstract * |