EP0903499 - Scroll compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.2005 [2005/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitsunaga, Toshihiko Daia Paresu 710, 2352, Uwanodai Fukuya-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto, Kenzo 2105-3, Kokai, Oizumi-machi Ora-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Sugimoto, Kazuyoshi 4-19-13, Nishikoizumi, Oizumi-machi Ora-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 04 /
Nishikawa, Takahiro 505-202, Uchigashima Ota-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 05 /
Fujiwara, Kazuaki 57-1, Sumiyoshi Oizumi-machi Ora-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 06 /
Sato, Kazuya 57-1, Sumiyoshi Oizumi-machi Ora-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 07 /
Sato, Takashi 2-37-2, Midori-cho Kumagaya-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1999/12] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98117556.5 | 16.09.1998 | [1999/12] | Priority number, date | JP19970252125 | 17.09.1997 Original published format: JP 25212597 | JP19970261933 | 26.09.1997 Original published format: JP 26193397 | JP19970267437 | 30.09.1997 Original published format: JP 26743797 | [1999/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0903499 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0903499 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | [1999/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0903499 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F04C18/02, F04C29/08, F04C29/02 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
F04C29/12 (EP,US);
F04C18/0215 (EP,US);
F04C18/0261 (EP,US);
F04C29/02 (EP,US);
F04C29/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/08] |
Former [1999/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Spiralverdichter | [1999/12] | English: | Scroll compressor | [1999/12] | French: | Compresseur à spirales | [1999/12] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 22.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03006364.8 / EP1319838 | EP03006365.5 / EP1319839 | EP03006366.3 / EP1319840 | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4494914 (SHIIBAYASHI MASAO [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 10, line 6 - line 33; figures 11,12 *; | [A]EP0648932 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [A] 1,2 * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]JPS61197786 ; | [A]JPS5867986 ; | [A]JPS59141785 ; | [A]JPH0658273 ; | [A]JPH0658270 ; | [A]JPH02294580 ; | [XY]DE9210747U (INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH INSTITUTE) [X] 12,13 * figure 6; claims 1-4 * [Y] 14-17; | [DYA]US5110268 (SAKURAI KAZUO [JP], et al) [DY] 16,17 * figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 6,7,10; | [Y]JPH02264181 ; | [X]US5013225 (RICHARDSON JR HUBERT [US]) [X] 12,13 * column 5, line 14 - column 6, line 19; figure 1 *; | [A]US5660539 (MATSUNAGA MUTSUNORI [JP], et al) [A] 12-17 * column 7, line 55 - column 8, line 6; figure 1 * * column 8, line 51 - column 9, line 32; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JPH03179189 ; | [A]JPH04203377 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870123), vol. 011, no. 025, Database accession no. (M - 556), & JP61197786 A 19860902 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830713), vol. 007, no. 159, Database accession no. (M - 228), & JP58067986 A 19830422 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841211), vol. 008, no. 270, Database accession no. (M - 344), & JP59141785 A 19840814 (MITSUBISHI DENKI KK) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940607), vol. 18, no. 297, Database accession no. (M - 1617), & JP06058273 A 19940301 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 6,7,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940607), vol. 018, no. 297, Database accession no. (M - 1617), & JP06058270 A 19940301 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 6,7,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910219), vol. 015, no. 069, Database accession no. (M - 1083), & JP02294580 A 19901205 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 6,7 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910111), vol. 015, no. 013, Database accession no. (M - 1069), & JP02264181 A 19901026 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 14,15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911030), vol. 015, no. 427, Database accession no. (M - 1174), & JP03179189 A 19910805 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 13-15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921116), vol. 016, no. 545, Database accession no. (M - 1337), & JP04203377 A 19920723 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 13-15 * abstract * |