EP0911256 - Guard for a cycloidal propeller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Schiffstechnik GmbH & Co. KG Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 4 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2003/21] |
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states Voith Hydro GmbH & Co. KG St. Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gross, Harald Aalweg 1 89542 Bolheim / DE | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 98117629.0 | 17.09.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | DE1997146977 | 24.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19746977 | [1999/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0911256 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0911256 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | [2001/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0911256 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B63H5/16, B63H1/08, B63H1/10 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
B63H1/08 (EP);
B63H5/165 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/17] | B63H5/16, B63H1/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB [2002/17] |
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schutzplatte für einen Zykloidalpropeller | [1999/17] | English: | Guard for a cycloidal propeller | [1999/17] | French: | Protecteur d'hélice cycloidal | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 02.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.12.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB707670 (VOITH GMBH J M) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1409346 (LIAAEN AS A M) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A] - JAN MORDHORST, "Immer stärkere Kraftprotze", SHIPBUILDING, (199708), pages 44 - 46, XP002136315 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | - hansa, (1965), vol. 16, pages 1543 - 1548 | - DRUCKSCHRIFT DER FIRMA VOITH, VOITH-SCHNEIDER-PROPELLER, 2500 B65, page 15 |