EP0905156 - Block copolymer, process for producing the same and resin composition of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-8622 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-City, Okayama 710-8622 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawa, Atsuhisa, Kuraray Co., Ltd. 2-1 Kaigandori 1-chome Okayama-shi, Okayama-ken 702-8045 / JP | 02 /
Shachi, Kenji, Kuraray Co., Ltd. 41 Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken 305-0841 / JP | 03 /
Itou, Atsushi, Kuraray Co., Ltd. 41 Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken 305-0841 / JP | 04 /
Ishiura, Kazushige, Kuraray Co., Ltd. 41 Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken 305-0841 / JP | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98118112.6 | 24.09.1998 | [1999/13] | Priority number, date | JP19970278081 | 25.09.1997 Original published format: JP 27808197 | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0905156 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0905156 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08F297/00, C08L53/00 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
C08L23/08 (EP,US);
C08F297/00 (EP,US);
C08L53/00 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,US);
C08L23/0846 (EP,US);
C08L29/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/08, C08L2666/24 (EP,US);
C08L77/00, C08L53/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/50] |
Former [1999/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Blockcopolymere, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und diese enthaltende Harzzusammensetzung | [2001/18] | English: | Block copolymer, process for producing the same and resin composition of the same | [1999/13] | French: | Copolymère à bloques, son procédé de préparation et son utilisation dans une composition de résine | [1999/13] |
Former [1999/13] | Bolckcopolymere, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und diese enthaltende Harzzusammensetzung | Examination procedure | 22.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 11.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0731112 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [X] 1 * page 4, lines 41-56 *; | [A]US4074035 (POWERS KENNETH W, et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]JPH08283462 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 02, Database accession no. 97-017500, XP002083904 & JPH08283462 A 19961029 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |