blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0911916

EP0911916 - Cathode-ray tube socket [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.07.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.08.2003  [2003/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hosiden Corporation
4-33, Kitakyuhoji 1-chome
Yao-shi, Osaka 581-0071 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/17]For all designated states
HOSIDEN CORPORATION
4-33, Kitakyuhoji 1-chome
Yao-shi, Osaka 581-0071 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nagata, Takayuki
14-6-2-B, Kitaishikiri-cho
Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka 579-8015 / JP
[1999/17]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Straße 29
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/17]Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103
82166 Gräfelfing / DE
Application number, filing date98118131.624.09.1998
[1999/17]
Priority number, dateJP1997029255524.10.1997         Original published format: JP 29255597
[1999/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0911916
Date:28.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0911916
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0911916
Date:28.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:H01R33/76
[1999/17]
CPC:
H01R33/7621 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/39]
Former [1999/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kathodenstrahlröhrensockel[1999/17]
English:Cathode-ray tube socket[1999/17]
French:Socle de tube à rayons cathodiques[1999/17]
Examination procedure24.09.1998Examination requested  [1999/17]
18.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2002Fee for grant paid
20.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH097717  ;
 [DYA]US4822301  (INABA HIROBUMI [JP], et al) [DY] 2-4,9,11 * column 3, line 26 - line 65; figures 1-6 *[A] 1
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 97, no. 5, & JP09007717 A 19970110 (MURATA) [X] 1,5,6 * abstract * [Y] 2-4,9,11
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.