blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0989204

EP0989204 - Process for preparing nitride film [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.04.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.06.2003  [2003/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JAPAN PIONICS CO., LTD.
1-3, Nishishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 105 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]For all designated states
JAPAN PIONICS CO., LTD.
1-3, Nishishinbashi 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takamatsu, Yukichi c/o Japan Pionics Co., Ltd.
Hiratsuka Laboratory 5181, Tamura
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Yoneyama, Takeo c/o Japan Pionics Co., Ltd.
Hiratsuka Laboratory 5181, Tamura
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
03 / Ishihama, Yoshiyasu c/o Japan Pionics Co., Ltd.
Hiratsuka Laboratory 5181, Tamura
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[2000/13]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte
Brucknerstraße 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]Türk - Gille - Hrabal - Struck
Patentanwälte - European Patent Attorneys, Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date98118259.525.09.1998
[2000/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0989204
Date:29.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.1999
ClassificationIPC:C23C16/34, C23C8/26
[2000/13]
CPC:
C23C16/34 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/49]
Former [2000/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Nitridschicht[2000/13]
English:Process for preparing nitride film[2000/13]
French:Procédé de préparation d' une couche de nitrure[2000/13]
Examination procedure02.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
23.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/24]
13.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH10182575  ;
 [Y]JPH07180058  ;
 [Y]JPS6052578  ;
 [E]EP0896406  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [E] 1 * paragraph [0181] *;
 [XY]DE4342730  (PEPPLER PETER DR) [X] 2 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 11 * [Y] 3,4;
 [A]JPH10190135  ;
 [A]JPS6372661
 [XY]  - NISHIDE S ET AL, "Study of the pyrolysis of tertiary butylhydrazine and GaN film growth", SECOND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON NITRIDE SEMICONDUCTORS, TOKUSHIMA, JAPAN, 27-31 OCT. 1997, ISSN 0022-0248, Journal of Crystal Growth, June 1998, Elsevier, Netherlands, vol. 189-190, pages 325 - 329, XP002093688 [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0002] * [Y] 3,4,6,7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-0248(98)00279-6
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 098, no. 012, & JP10182575 A 19980707 (JAPAN PIONICS CO LTD) [Y] 3,4 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 095, no. 010, & JP07180058 A 19950718 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 6 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 18, Database accession no. 85-108095, XP002093700 & JPS6052578 A 19850325 (NEC CORP) [Y] 7 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. - , & JP10190135 A 19980721 (XEROX CORP) [A] 2-4 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 23, Database accession no. 1988129551, XP002117394 & JPS6372661 A 19880402 (SAKB) [A] 2-4 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.