15.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
23.03.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
30.09.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
15.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] |
18.03.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] |
18.02.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] |
18.02.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] |
28.01.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] |
24.12.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] |
26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
05.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] |
29.10.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] |
27.02.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] |
18.02.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.02.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.10.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.10.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.05.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.05.2003 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
06.05.2003 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
11.12.2002 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
09.10.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.01.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.10.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.08.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.05.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.03.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.10.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
21.10.2000 |
First examination report |
|
19.10.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.10.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.08.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 11.10.2000 [2000/41] |
26.05.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] |
17.12.1999 |
Publication of search report |
published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] |
19.02.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.04.1999 [1999/14] |