EP0907104 - Photographic processing composition and processing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inaba, Tadashi Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kojima, Tetsuro Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Miyazaki, Hideo Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98118308.0 | 25.09.1998 | [1999/14] | Priority number, date | JP19970261836 | 26.09.1997 Original published format: JP 26183697 | [1999/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0907104 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0907104 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0907104 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/42, G03C7/407, G03C5/305, G03C5/42, C07C229/76 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
C07C229/16 (EP);
G03C5/268 (EP);
G03C5/3053 (EP);
G03C7/42 (EP);
C07B2200/07 (EP);
G03C7/3046 (EP);
G03C7/413 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/14] | Title | German: | Photographische Verarbeitungszusammensetzung und photographisches Verarbeitungsverfahren | [1999/14] | English: | Photographic processing composition and processing method | [1999/14] | French: | Composition et méthode de traitement photographique | [1999/14] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 24.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.05.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.04.2004 | BE | 14.04.2004 | CH | 14.04.2004 | CY | 14.04.2004 | FI | 14.04.2004 | FR | 14.04.2004 | IT | 14.04.2004 | LI | 14.04.2004 | NL | 14.04.2004 | DK | 14.07.2004 | GR | 14.07.2004 | SE | 14.07.2004 | ES | 25.07.2004 | PT | 14.09.2004 | GB | 25.09.2004 | LU | 25.09.2004 | IE | 27.09.2004 | MC | 30.09.2004 | [2008/12] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
BE | 14.04.2004 | ||
CH | 14.04.2004 | ||
CY | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
FR | 14.04.2004 | ||
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
NL | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
GB | 25.09.2004 | ||
LU | 25.09.2004 | ||
IE | 27.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
BE | 14.04.2004 | ||
CH | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
FR | 14.04.2004 | ||
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
NL | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
GB | 25.09.2004 | ||
IE | 27.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
BE | 14.04.2004 | ||
CH | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
NL | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
GB | 25.09.2004 | ||
IE | 27.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
BE | 14.04.2004 | ||
CH | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
IE | 27.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
BE | 14.04.2004 | ||
CH | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
BE | 14.04.2004 | ||
CH | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
BE | 14.04.2004 | ||
CH | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
CH | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 14.04.2004 | |
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 14.04.2004 | |
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 14.04.2004 | |
LI | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 14.04.2004 | |
LI | 14.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0584665 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [X] 1-8 * page 2, line 3 - line 7 * * page 3, line 39 - line 50 * * page 5 compound A-2 * * page 7, compound A-16 * * page 8, compounds A-22, A-23 * * page 8, line 32 - line 47 * * page 9, line 16 - line 19 * * page 10, line 33 - line 42 * * experiments 1-31 - 1-36, 2-31 - 2-42 * * example 3, samples C, F * * examples 5,6 * * claims 1-9 *; | [A]EP0762203 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 2, line 3 - line 4 * * page 2, line 57 - page 3, line 1 * * page 4, line 2 - line 4 * * example 4 ** claims 1,3,6-9,11-13,18 * | Examination | JPS62143048 |