EP0904767 - Dental materials based on oligomers or polymers obtained by ring-opening metathesis polymerization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M ESPE AG Espe Platz 82229 Seefeld / DE | [2002/01] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states ESPE Dental AG Espe Platz 82229 Seefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bissinger, Peter Gabelsberger Strasse 11 86415 Mering / DE | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2005/32] |
Former [1999/13] | Freiherr von Wittgenstein, Arved, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98118366.8 | 29.09.1998 | [1999/13] | Priority number, date | DE1997142980 | 29.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19742980 | [1999/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0904767 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0904767 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0904767 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/083 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
A61K6/887 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2004/44] |
Former [1999/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Dentalmassen auf der Basis von ROMP-Oligomeren oder -Polymeren | [1999/13] | English: | Dental materials based on oligomers or polymers obtained by ring-opening metathesis polymerization | [1999/13] | French: | Matériau dentaire à base d'oligomères ou polymères obtenus par polymérisation par méthathèse par ouverture de cycle | [1999/13] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 31.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 14.12.2005 | [2008/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0792881 (IVOCLAR AG [LI]) [X] 1-6,8-11 * the whole document * [Y] 1-11; | [Y]DE19608313 (IVOCLAR AG [LI]) [Y] 1-11 * page 6; examples 3-6 *; | [X]EP0796607 (IVOCLAR AG [LI]) [X] 1-6,8-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9507310 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |