EP0926286 - Method for making knitwear on a flat bed knitting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2004 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H. Stoll GmbH & Co. Stollweg 1 72760 Reutlingen / DE | [2003/50] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states H. Stoll GmbH & Co. Stollweg 1 D-72760 Reutlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOLL, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Memminger Strasse 7 72762 Reutlingen / DE | 02 /
SCHMID, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. Eichenweg 20 72411 Bodelshausen / DE | 03 /
REMPP, Wolfgang Breslauer Strasse 29 72501 Gammertingen / DE | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Möbus, Daniela, et al Patentanwältin Dr. Möbus Kaiserstrasse 85 72764 Reutlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Möbus, Daniela, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Rudolf Möbus, Dr.-Ing. Daniela Möbus, Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Schwan, Hindenburgstrasse 65 72762 Reutlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98118629.9 | 01.10.1998 | [1999/26] | Priority number, date | DE1997156055 | 17.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19756055 | [1999/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0926286 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0926286 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0926286 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D04B15/96 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
D04B15/96 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT [2001/05] |
Former [1999/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gestricks auf einer Flachstrickmaschine | [1999/26] | English: | Method for making knitwear on a flat bed knitting machine | [1999/26] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de tricot dans un métier à tricoter rectiligne | [1999/26] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 02.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB639118 (LANCASHIRE DYNAMO AND CRYPTO L, et al); | [A]US3469418 (STABELER EBERHARD, et al); | [A]GB2195360 (STOLL & CO H) [A] 1,4 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0276383 (STOLL & CO H [DE]) [A] 1,4 * page 2, column 1, line 1 - line 51 * * page 3, column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 14 * * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2201167 (STOLL & CO H) [A] 1-5 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 * |