EP0907144 - Method for extracting a three-dimensional model from a sequence of images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 SH 249 Houston, Texas 77070 / US | ||
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states Compaq Computer Corporation 20555 S.H. 249 Houston Texas 77070 / US | ||
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 111 Powdermill Road Maynard, Massachusetts 01754 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kang, Sing Bing 1600 Massachussetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Charig, Raymond Julian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [1999/14] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98118696.8 | 02.10.1998 | [1999/14] | Priority number, date | US19970943774 | 03.10.1997 Original published format: US 943774 | [1999/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0907144 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0907144 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | [2001/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06T17/00 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
G06T7/579 (EP,US);
G06V10/10 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US);
G06V2201/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/14] | G06T7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/02] |
Former [1999/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Extrahieren eines dreidimensionalen Modells aus einer Bildsequenz | [1999/14] | English: | Method for extracting a three-dimensional model from a sequence of images | [1999/14] | French: | Procédé d'extraction d'un modèle tridimensionnel à partir d'une séquence d'images | [1999/14] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 19.10.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IT, NL | 15.11.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.11.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - FUA P ET AL, "TAKING ADVANTAGE OF IMAGE-BASED AND GEOMETRY-BASED CONSTRAINTS TO RECOVER 3-D SURFACES", COMPUTER VISION AND IMAGE UNDERSTANDING,US,ACADEMIC PRESS, (19960701), vol. 64, no. 1, ISSN 1077-3142, pages 111 - 127, XP000637132 [A] 1-8 * section 1, paragraph 2 * * section 2, paragraphs 1 to 4 * * section 2.1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/cviu.1996.0048 | [A] - SING BING KANG ET AL, "A parallel feature tracker for extended image sequences", COMPUTER VISION AND IMAGE UNDERSTANDING, SEPT. 1997, ACADEMIC PRESS, USA, vol. 67, no. 3, ISSN 1077-3142, pages 296 - 310, XP002160539 [A] 1,2,5 * sections 3 to 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/cviu.1996.0519 | [A] - JEBARA T S ET AL, "PARAMETRIZED STRUCTURE FROM MOTION FOR 3D ADAPTIVE FEEDBACK TRACKING OF FACES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION,US,LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, (19970617), vol. CONF. 16, ISBN 0-7803-4236-4, pages 144 - 150, XP000776504 [A] 1-8 * section 1 * | [A] - HARTLEY R I, "AN ALGORITHM FOR SELF CALIBRATION FROM SEVERAL VIEWS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION,US,LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, (19940621), ISBN 0-8186-5827-4, pages 908 - 912, XP000515957 [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - DECARLO D ET AL, "THE INTEGRATION OF OPTICAL FLOW AND DEFORMABLE MODELS WITH APPLICATIONS TO HUMAN FACE SHAPE AND MOTION ESTIMATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION,US,LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, (19960618), ISBN 0-8186-7258-7, pages 231 - 238, XP000640246 [A] 1-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.1996.517079 |