Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0908562 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2004 | B1 | EP0908562 | 14.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI972297 | 10.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE284468T | 15.12.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI972297 | 10.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69828016T | 22.12.2005 | T2 | DE69828016D1 | 13.01.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI972297 | 10.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2235279T | 01.07.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITMI972297 | 10.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1295307 | 04.05.1999 | B1 | ITMI972297 | 10.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI972297 | 10.10.1997 |