EP0908562 - A finishing machine for laying bituminous aggregates equipped with an improved expandable screed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BITELLI S.p.A. Via IV Novembre 2 40061 Minerbio (BO) / IT | [1999/52] |
Former [1999/15] | For all designated states NIARB S.A. Via Campagna Adorna CH-6852 Genestrerio (TI) / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Domenighetti, Domenico Via Mazzini 2C 6900 Lugano / CH | [1999/15] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/48] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/50] | Bonini, Ercole c/o STUDIO ING. E. BONINI SRL Corso Fogazzaro 8 36100 Vicenza / IT | ||
Former [1999/15] | Zavattoni, Maria Chiara, et al Racheli & C. s.r.l., Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 20144 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98118776.8 | 05.10.1998 | [1999/15] | Priority number, date | IT1997MI02297 | 10.10.1997 Original published format: IT MI972297 | [1999/15] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0908562 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0908562 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E01C19/42 | [1999/15] | CPC: |
E01C19/42 (EP);
E01C2301/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/52] |
Former [1999/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | SI | 13.10.1999 | Title | German: | Strassendeckenfertiger für Asphalt mit ausziehbarer Bohle | [1999/15] | English: | A finishing machine for laying bituminous aggregates equipped with an improved expandable screed | [1999/15] | French: | Finisseuse de route pour asphalte avec poutre lisseuse extensible | [1999/15] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 15.10.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, GR, LU, MC | 25.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 22.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.12.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.12.2004 | BE | 08.12.2004 | CH | 08.12.2004 | FI | 08.12.2004 | LI | 08.12.2004 | NL | 08.12.2004 | SE | 08.03.2005 | PT | 08.05.2005 | [2008/12] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
NL | 08.12.2004 | ||
SE | 08.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
NL | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 08.12.2004 | |
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 08.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0109639 (DOMENIGHETTI DOMENICO) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0493889 (BLAW KNOX CONST EQUIPMENT [GB]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE29505382U (DYNAPAC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 6 - page 8, line 17; figure - * | by applicant | CH657168 |