EP0911106 - Protective lining for pressure equipment which can be used in processes for the synthesis of urea [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNAMPROGETTI S.p.A. Viale De Gasperi, 16 20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states SNAMPROGETTI S.p.A. Viale De Gasperi, 16 20097 San Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT | ||
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states SNAMPROGETTI S.p.A. Viale De Gasperi, 16 I-20097 San Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miola, Cesare Via Volta, 19 Sannazzaro (Pavia) / IT | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2001/48] | Bordonaro, Salvatore, et al EniTecnologie S.p.A. Patent and Licensing Dept. Via Felice Maritano 26 20097 S. Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | ||
Former [1999/17] | Gennari, Marco, Dr. c/o EniTecnologie S.p.A., BREL, Via F. Maritano, 26 20097 San Donato Milanese, Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98118996.2 | 08.10.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | IT1997MI02386 | 23.10.1997 Original published format: IT MI972386 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0911106 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0911106 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP0911106 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/04, B32B15/01 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
B32B15/011 (EP,US);
B01J19/02 (EP,US);
B23K9/18 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00256 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0236 (EP,US);
Y02P20/141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, LI, NL [2000/02] |
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schutzauskleidung für Druckeinrichtung insbesondere zum Verwenden im Harnstoffsyntheseverfahren | [1999/17] | English: | Protective lining for pressure equipment which can be used in processes for the synthesis of urea | [1999/17] | French: | Garnissage de protection pour dispositf sous pression notamment à utiliser dans la synthèse d'urée | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 05.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 25.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33] | Request for further processing for: | 04.08.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 04.08.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.08.2003 | Decision despatched | 30.07.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 30.07.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.08.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2018/28] | ES | 25.08.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3066402 (REX INGELS GLENN) [Y] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US3624345 (ARMSTRONG FRANK W); | [A]EP0114893 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]); | [A]US4600139 (MURASE NORIYOSHI [JP]); | [A]EP0511084 (CREUSOT LOIRE [FR]); | [A]US5362937 (BROWNE GEORGE W [AU], et al); | [Y]WO9500674 (SANDVIK AB [SE]) [Y] 1,10 * claims 1,14,15 *; | [A]WO9609136 (SNAM PROGETTI [IT], et al) | Examination | US2764805 | US4431447 |