Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] |
24.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] |
25.06.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] |
12.12.2003 | Change - applicant | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] |
10.10.2003 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] |
10.10.2003 | Change - applicant | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] |
10.10.2003 | Change - representative | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] |
09.08.2003 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.07.2003 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
23.07.2003 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
18.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
23.10.2002 | Renewal fee | |
13.05.2002 | Examination report or reply | |
22.01.2002 | Examination report or reply | |
02.11.2001 | First examination report | |
30.10.2001 | Examination report or reply | |
18.10.2001 | Renewal fee | |
23.10.2000 | Renewal fee | |
13.01.2000 | Change - extension states | |
19.11.1999 | Definitive list of designations | published on 05.01.2000 [2000/01] |
29.10.1999 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] |
05.03.1999 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.04.1999 [1999/16] |