Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6150118 | 21.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US6223497 | 16.10.1997 | US17287798 | 15.10.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH11190738 | Global Dossier | 13.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US6223497 | 16.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0909954 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2003 | B1 | EP0909954 | 21.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6223497 | 16.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE255228T | 15.12.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US6223497 | 16.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59810255D1 | 08.01.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US6223497 | 16.10.1997 |