Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6471899 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP98119409 | 14.10.1998 | EP9907755 | 14.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7267825 | 11.09.2007 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP98119409 | 14.10.1998 | EP9907755 | 14.10.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0022151 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP98119409 | 14.10.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1001031 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2006 | B1 | EP1001031 | 17.05.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP98119409 | 14.10.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE329046T | 15.06.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP98119409 | 14.10.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69834813T | 24.05.2007 | T2 | DE69834813D1 | 20.07.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP98119409 | 14.10.1998 |