EP1001031 - Parvovirus-vectors and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | For all designated states Yale University 433 Temple Street New Haven, CT 06511 / US | [2006/23] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | ||
For all designated states Yale University 433 Temple Street New Haven, CT 06511 / US | |||
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rommelaere, Jean, Prof.Dr. Rombachweg 5 69118 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Tatersall, Peter, Dr. School of Medicine P.O.Box 208079 New Haven Connecticut / US | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | Schüssler, Andrea, Dr. Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98119409.5 | 14.10.1998 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1001031 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1001031 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/86, C12N5/10, A61K48/00 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K14/523 (EP,US);
C07K14/55 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C12N2750/14343 (EP,US);
C12N2750/14352 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/04] |
Former [2000/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Parvovirus-Vektoren und deren Verwendung | [2000/20] | English: | Parvovirus-vectors and their use | [2000/20] | French: | Vecteurs parvoviraux et leurs applications | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 04.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2006 | BE | 07.06.2006 | CH | 07.06.2006 | FI | 07.06.2006 | IT | 07.06.2006 | LI | 07.06.2006 | NL | 07.06.2006 | DK | 07.09.2006 | SE | 07.09.2006 | GR | 08.09.2006 | ES | 18.09.2006 | LU | 14.10.2006 | IE | 16.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | PT | 07.11.2006 | [2008/36] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
IE | 16.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/12] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
IE | 16.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/17] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 07.09.2006 | |
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 07.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5302517 (RHODE III SOLON L [US]) [A] 1-20 * figure 2 *; | [A]WO9413823 (COMPANY S A Z [BE], et al) [A] 1-6,9-11,15,17-20 * page 8, line 36 - page 29 *; | [X] - DUPONT F ET AL., "Use of an autonomous parvovirus vector for selective transfer of a foreign gene into transformed human cells of different tissue origins and its expression therein", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY US, (199403), vol. 68, no. 3, pages 1397 - 1406, XP002096869 [X] 1-6,9,10,15,17-19 * figure 1 * | [X] - MAXWELL I H ET AL, "Autonomous parvovirus transduction of a gene under control of tissue-specific or inducible promoters", GENE THERAPY, (199601), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 28 - 36, XP000651804 [X] 1-5,9,15-18 * figure 1 * | [AD] - COTMORE S & TATTERSALL P, "An asymmetric nucleotide in the parvoviral 3' hairpin directs segregation of a single active origin", EMBO JOURNAL, EYNSHAM, OXFORD GB, (1994), vol. 13, no. 17, pages 4145 - 4152, XP002096870 [AD] 1 * figure 4 * | [A] - TAM P & ASTELL C R, "Multiple cellular factors bind to cis-regulatory elements found inboard of the 5'palindrome of Minute Virus of Mice", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY US, (199405), vol. 68, no. 5, pages 2480 - 2848, XP002096871 [A] 2 * the whole document * |