Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
28.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
04.12.2001 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
12.05.2001 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
12.05.2001 | Renewal fee | |
30.11.2000 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
12.03.1999 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.04.1999 [1999/17] |