EP0911253 - Power unit for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hori, Yoshiaki, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Nishi, Tohru, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Kanno, Yoshihisa, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke, F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber, Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm, Kopernikusstrasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98119637.1 | 16.10.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | JP19970288964 | 21.10.1997 Original published format: JP 28896497 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0911253 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0911253 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0911253 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62M25/08, B60K17/08, // F16D48/06, F16H61/32 , F16H63:18 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
F02B61/02 (EP,US);
F16H61/32 (EP,US);
F16H63/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2001/04] |
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Antriebseinheit für Fahrzeug | [1999/17] | English: | Power unit for vehicle | [1999/17] | French: | Unité motrice pour véhicule | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 24.07.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5515940 (SHICHINOHE TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 48 - line 62; figures 3,4; claim 1 *; | [A]US5542309 (WENGER URS [CH], et al) [A] 1* column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 23; figures 1,2 * |