EP0911883 - Bipolar transistor with a SiGe epitaxial base layer and method of fabrication the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | ||
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoyama, Tohru c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98119698.3 | 19.10.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | JP19970291887 | 24.10.1997 Original published format: JP 29188797 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0911883 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0911883 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | [1999/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/737, H01L21/331 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
H01L29/66242 (EP,US);
H01L27/06 (KR);
H01L29/7378 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/03] |
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bipolartransistor mit einer SiGe epitaktischen Basisschicht und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1999/17] | English: | Bipolar transistor with a SiGe epitaxial base layer and method of fabrication the same | [1999/17] | French: | Transistor bipolaire avec une couche de base épitaxiale en SiGe et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 01.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 08.09.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0701287 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * column 11, line 54 - line 58 *; | [XDA] - AOYAMA T ET AL, "CL2 INFLUENCE ON SI1-XGEX BASE EPITAXIAL LAYER GROWTH FOR HIGH SPEED BIPOLAR TRANSISTOR", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SOLID STATE DEVICES AND MATERIALS, (199709), page 528/529, XP000728224 [XD] 1-6 * figures 1B,3,4 * * page 528, column 1, line 17 - line 21 * * paragraph [0002] * * page 529, column 2, line 1 - line 13 * [A] 7-10 | [AD] - SATO F ET AL, "A SUPER SELF-ALIGNED SELECTIVELY GROWN SIGE BASE (SSSB) BIPOLAR TRANSISTOR FABRICATED BY COLD-WALL TYPE UHV/CVD TECHNOLOGY", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, (19940801), vol. 41, no. 8, pages 1373 - 1378, XP000483757 [AD] 1-10 * page 1374, column 1 * * page 1375, column 1 * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/16.297732 | [A] - TORU TATSUMI ET AL, "SELECTIVE EPITAXIAL GROWTH BY UHV-CVD USING SI2H6 AND CL2", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, (19920502), vol. 120, no. 1 / 04, pages 275 - 278, XP000276711 [A] 7 * page 276, column 1, line 10 - line 15 * * page 277, column 1, line 13 - line 20 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(92)90402-5 |