EP0890437 - A liquid ink printing apparatus and system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Silverbrook, Kia Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | Reichert, Werner Franz, et al Kodak Aktiengesellschaft Patent Department 70323 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | Reichert, Werner F., Dr. rer.nat., Dipl.-Phys., et al Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patent Department 70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98119751.0 | 09.04.1996 | [1999/02] | Priority number, date | AU1995PN02308 | 12.04.1995 Original published format: AU PN230895 | AU1995PN02310 | 12.04.1995 Original published format: AU PN231095 | AU1995PN02311 | 12.04.1995 Original published format: AU PN231195 | AU1995PN02312 | 12.04.1995 Original published format: AU PN231295 | [1999/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0890437 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0890437 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | [1999/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0890437 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/04, B41J2/06, B41J2/005 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
B41J2/005 (EP,KR);
B41J2/065 (KR);
B41J2/04 (KR);
B41J2/14451 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/02] | B41J2/04, B41J2/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/02] | Title | German: | Apparat und System zum Drucken mit flüssiger Tinte | [1999/02] | English: | A liquid ink printing apparatus and system | [1999/02] | French: | Appareil et système d'impression à l'encre liquide | [1999/02] | Examination procedure | 29.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 26.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96911663.1 / EP0765235 | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 21.08.2002 | GB | 09.04.2003 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/22] | GB | 09.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2949808 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5305016 (QUATE CALVIN F [US]) [Y] 1,5,9 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4752784 (SAITO KOICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 2-4,7,10 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0493102 (XEROX CORP [US]) [Y] 6 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPS61272161 ; | [A]EP0400955 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870424), vol. 011, no. 131, Database accession no. (M - 584), & JP61272161 A 19861202 (NEC CORP) [Y] 8 * abstract * | [A] - GREANIAS E C, "HYDRAULIC-ELECTROSTATIC PRINTER", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19701001), vol. 13, no. 5, page 1131/1132, XP002006675 [A] 1,4,5 | Examination | US4737803 | by applicant | US1941001 | US3373437 | US3416153 | US3946398 | GB2007162 | US4490728 | US4275290 | US4737803 |