blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0911109

EP0911109 - Method for monitoring laser weld quality via plasma light intensity measurements [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/17]Method an apparatus for monitoring laser weld quality via plasma light intensity measurements
[2003/01]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.09.2004  [2004/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRW INC.
One Space Park Redondo Beach
California 90278 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/17]For all designated states
TRW Inc.
One Space Park
Redondo Beach, California 90278 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chou, Mau-Song
5526 Scotwood Drive
Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90275 / US
02 / Shih, Christopher C.
19945 Linda
Torrance, CA 90503 / US
03 / Shirk, Bryan W.
2662 North Robin Lane
Mesa, Arizona 85213 / US
[1999/17]
Representative(s)Schmidt, Steffen J.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/17]Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date98119779.123.10.1998
[1999/17]
Priority number, dateUS1997095660723.10.1997         Original published format: US 956607
[1999/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0911109
Date:28.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0911109
Date:22.03.2000
[2000/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0911109
Date:10.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.2000
ClassificationIPC:B23K26/02
[1999/17]
CPC:
B23K26/032 (EP,US); B23K26/06 (EP,US); B23K26/064 (EP,US);
B23K26/0648 (EP,US); B23K26/0665 (EP,US); B23K26/123 (EP,US);
B23K26/21 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   IT [2000/48]
Former [1999/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Überwachung der Schweissqualität durch Messungen der Plasmalichtintensität[2003/01]
English:Method for monitoring laser weld quality via plasma light intensity measurements[2003/01]
French:Méthode de contrôle de la qualité du soudage par mesures de l'intensité lumineuse du plasma[2003/01]
Former [1999/17]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überwachung der Schweissqualität durch Messungen der Plasmalichtintensität
Former [1999/17]Method an apparatus for monitoring laser weld quality via plasma light intensity measurements
Former [1999/17]Méthode et appareil de contrôle de la qualité du soudage par mesures de l'intensité lumineuse du plasma
Examination procedure11.11.1998Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
15.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2003Fee for grant paid
11.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4839493  (HERZIGER GERD [DE], et al) [Y] 3,6,11 * figure 3A *;
 [X]DE4124162  (OVERMEYER, LUDGER) [X] 9,12 * column 2, line 7 - line 63; figure . *;
 [Y]US5256852  (BOUDOT CECILE [FR]) [Y] 13 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 26 *;
 [A]US5272312  (JURCA MARIUS-CHRISTIAN [DE]);
 [X]US5329091  (BISSINGER NORBERT [DE]) [X] 9,12 * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 27; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE4313287  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]);
 [XAY]US5360960  (SHIRK BRYAN W [US]) [X] 1,2,9,12 * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 47; figures 1,2 * [A] 4,5,7,8,10,14 [Y] 3,6,11,13;
 [A]DE4439714  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 13
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.