Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3880160B | Global Dossier | 14.02.2007 | B2 | JPH11125179 | 11.05.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP28878197 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0911521 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2004 | B1 | EP0911521 | 07.07.1999 | A3 | EP0911521 | 28.04.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP28878197 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69822067T | 22.07.2004 | T2 | DE69822067D1 | 08.04.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP28878197 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6158325 | 12.12.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP28878197 | 21.10.1997 |