Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH11227166 | Global Dossier | 24.08.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19754323 | 08.12.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0920992 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2000 | A3 | EP0920992 | 09.06.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19754323 | 08.12.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19754323 | 10.06.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19754323 | 08.12.1997 |