EP0911486 - Gas turbine stationary blade cooling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | ||
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuno, Hiroki, Takasago Mach. Works of Mits. H. Ind. Ltd. 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98120025.6 | 22.10.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | JP19970295408 | 28.10.1997 Original published format: JP 29540897 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0911486 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0911486 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0911486 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/04, F01D25/12, F01D5/18 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
F01D5/189 (EP,US);
F01D9/065 (EP,US);
F05B2240/801 (US);
F05D2240/81 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/17] | F01D5/18, F01D25/12, F01D9/04 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/37] |
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kühlung einer Gasturbinenleitschaufel | [1999/17] | English: | Gas turbine stationary blade cooling | [1999/17] | French: | Refroidissement d'une aube de guidage pour une turbine à gaz | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 26.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5609466 (NORTH WILLIAM E [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 48 - column 6, line 2; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US5634766 (CUNHA FRANCISCO J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 14, line 63 - column 15, line 51; figure 22 *; | [A]GB2093923 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * page 2, line 115 - line 124; figure 7 *; | [A]JPH05163959 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931018), vol. 017, no. 572, Database accession no. (M - 1497), & JP05163959 A 19930629 (TOHOKU ELECTRIC POWER CO INC;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1 * abstract * |