EP0911215 - A control device for an actuator of a vehicle headlamp adjustment unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sylea Italia S.r.l. Via L. Colli, 20 10129 Torino / IT | [1999/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monti, Carlo Via Fubine, 79 15023 Felizzano / IT | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Franzolin, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Franzolin, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 98120035.5 | 22.10.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | IT1997TO00211U | 24.10.1997 Original published format: IT TO970211 U | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0911215 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0911215 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/076 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
B60Q1/076 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/34] |
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steuerungseinrichtung für die Einstellungseinrichtung eines Kfz-Scheinwerfers | [1999/17] | English: | A control device for an actuator of a vehicle headlamp adjustment unit | [1999/17] | French: | Dispositif de commande pour l'unité de réglage d'un phare de véhicule | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 03.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/48] | 06.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0367668 (VALEO ELECTRONIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * [A] 4,6,7; | [XA]FR2624628 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * figure 2 * [A] 4,6,7; | [XA]US5414335 (SATO YOSHIHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-4 * figure 2 * [A] 5-7; | [XA]EP0466539 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [A] 4,6 |