blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0953367

EP0953367 - Permanently presurized manual fire extinguisher [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.11.2009
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.11.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.12.2009  [2009/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PALLESKE, Hagen
Grosse Deichstrasse 31
25348 Glückstadt / DE
[2009/04]
Former [1999/44]For all designated states
Hagen, Palleske
Grosse Deichstrasse 31
25348 Glückstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/44]
Representative(s)RGTH
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Neuer Wall 10
20354 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/44]Richter, Werdermann & Gerbaulet
Neuer Wall 10
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date98120378.928.10.1998
[1999/44]
Priority number, dateDE1998207814U30.04.1998         Original published format: DE 29807814 U
[1999/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0953367
Date:03.11.1999
Language:DE
[1999/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0953367
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0953367
Date:21.01.2009
Language:DE
[2009/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:A62C13/62, A62C13/76
[1999/44]
CPC:
A62C13/76 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE [2000/39]
Former [1999/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Dauerdruckhandfeuerlöscher[1999/44]
English:Permanently presurized manual fire extinguisher[1999/44]
French:Extincteur d'incendie à main sous pression permanente[1999/44]
Examination procedure15.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
20.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
03.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
21.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2008Fee for grant paid
26.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.10.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/53]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
22.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
24.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
29.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
30.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200710   M06   Fee paid on   29.02.2008
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]GB1556217  (FIRESNOW LTD) [X] 1-3,5 * page 1, line 57 - page 2, line 32; figure - *;
 [A]GB2156213  (MOHLER) [A] 1 * page 1, line 55 - page 2, line 10; figure . *;
 [A]US5458201  (BRIM) [A] 1 * column 3, line 18 - column 6, line 16; figure - *
ExaminationUS4098343
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.