EP0914898 - Waste water avoiding brazing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Fluor und Derivate GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | For all designated states Solvay Fluor und Derivate GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 D-30173 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lauzon, Daniel Clément Mendelssohnstrasse 8 30173 Hannover / DE | 02 /
Schwarze, Thomas Freundallee 3a 30173 Hannover / DE | [1999/19] | Representative(s) | Gosmann, Martin, et al Abbott Products GmbH IP Department (PH-ZP) Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Gosmann, Martin, Dr., et al Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Patentabteilung Postfach 220 30002 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1999/19] | Lauer, Dieter, Dr. Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 98120454.8 | 29.10.1998 | [1999/19] | Priority number, date | DE1997149042 | 06.11.1997 Original published format: DE 19749042 | [1999/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0914898 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B23K35/363, B23K1/20 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
B23K35/3605 (EP,US);
B23K1/008 (KR);
B23K1/19 (EP,US);
B23K3/08 (KR);
B23K35/362 (KR);
B23K37/00 (KR);
B23K2103/10 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/03] |
Former [1999/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Abwasser vermeidendes Lötverfahren | [1999/19] | English: | Waste water avoiding brazing method | [1999/19] | French: | Procédé de brasage évitant de l'eau usée | [1999/19] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 20.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/48] | 25.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3971501 (COOKE WILLIAM ERNEST); | [A]GB2050905 (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0091231 (ALCAN INT LTD [CA]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5409613 (WEAVER THOMAS J M [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |