EP0915346 - Current sensing circuit with high input impedance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertolini, Luca Via Veniero 11 20148 Milano / IT | [1999/19] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1999/19] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98120634.5 | 03.11.1998 | [1999/19] | Priority number, date | IT1997MI02485 | 06.11.1997 Original published format: IT MI972485 | [1999/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0915346 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0915346 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01R19/00, G01R19/10 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
G01R19/0023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/37] |
Former [1999/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stromfühlerschaltung mit hoher Eingangsimpedanz | [1999/19] | English: | Current sensing circuit with high input impedance | [1999/19] | French: | Circuit de détection de courant à haute impédance d'entrée | [1999/19] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 12.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/01] | 14.12.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | 10.05.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.05.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9627235 (LATTICE SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A] - COUNTS L., WURCER S., "Instrumentation amplifier nears input noise floor", ELECTRONIC DESIGN, (19820610), vol. 30, no. 12, pages 177 - 186, XP002150574 [A] 1 * page 181; figures A-D * | [A] - JUNG W G, "Stable FET-input op amps achieve precision performance", EDN, 10 NOV. 1982, USA, (19821110), vol. 27, no. 22, ISSN 0012-7515, pages 131 - 140, XP002150575 [A] 1 * page 137; figure 1 * |