Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0919673 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0919673



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 277
01.12.2004 Closing of application Search / examination 2
16.08.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
08.01.2004 Late/insufficient payment of the renewal fee without additional fee Search / examination 1
24.12.2003 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
24.12.2002 Claims Search / examination 11
24.12.2002 Description Search / examination 18
24.12.2002 Drawings Search / examination 11
24.12.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.12.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 38
29.10.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.10.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.10.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.06.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
21.06.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.05.2002 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.01.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
08.01.2002 Claims Search / examination 3
08.01.2002 Description Search / examination 3
08.01.2002 Drawings Search / examination 1
08.01.2002 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
08.01.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
22.10.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
22.10.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.09.2001 Request for accelerated examination Search / examination 1
13.09.2001 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.08.2001 General enquiry Search / examination 1
08.03.2001 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
27.02.2001 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
05.02.2001 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
11.01.2001 General enquiry Search / examination 1
21.11.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
28.09.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
28.09.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.09.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
18.09.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.04.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
15.04.1999 Amendments not yet acceptable Search / examination 1
15.04.1999 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
01.04.1999 Extension of time limit granted Search / examination 1
01.04.1999 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
25.03.1999 Description Search / examination 3
25.03.1999 Drawings Search / examination 2
25.03.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
25.03.1999 Priority document Search / examination 49
23.03.1999 Drawings Search / examination 2
23.03.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
26.01.1999 Deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
22.01.1999 Communication on invalid designation/extension/validation of states Search / examination 1
02.11.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.11.1998 Claims Search / examination 18
02.11.1998 Description Search / examination 45
02.11.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.11.1998 Drawings Search / examination 17
02.11.1998 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 2
02.11.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6