Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0919673
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.12.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] |
11.08.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.12.2003 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.01.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.12.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.10.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.06.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.05.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
30.04.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.01.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.01.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
29.11.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.10.2001 |
First examination report |
|
18.10.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
18.10.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.10.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
28.09.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
15.06.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 01.08.2001 [2001/31] |
23.03.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.05.2001 [2001/19] |
29.09.2000 |
Publication of search report |
published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] |
22.09.2000 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.11.2000 [2000/45] |
30.11.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.04.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] |