blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0919673

EP0919673 - Procedure and layered elements controlling and ruling thermally and bodyoriented the interior climate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.01.2005  [2005/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hergenroeder, Karl Heinz
Spessartstrasse 3
63263 Neu-Isenburg / DE
[1999/22]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/22]
Application number, filing date98120775.602.11.1998
[1999/22]
Priority number, dateDE199714835203.11.1997         Original published format: DE 19748352
[1999/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0919673
Date:02.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0919673
Date:15.11.2000
[2000/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.2000
ClassificationIPC:E04B1/62, E04B1/76
[2000/45]
CPC:
A01G9/246 (EP); B60H1/00 (EP); E04B1/74 (EP);
E04B9/001 (EP); E04B9/02 (EP); E04H1/125 (EP);
F24F5/0046 (EP); E04H2001/1288 (EP); Y02A30/272 (EP);
Y02A40/25 (EP); Y02A40/28 (EP); Y02B10/20 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [1999/22]E04B1/62
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   PT,   SE [2001/31]
Former [1999/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Schichtelemente zur thermischen und körperorientierten Beherrschung und Steuerung des Innenklimas[1999/22]
English:Procedure and layered elements controlling and ruling thermally and bodyoriented the interior climate[1999/22]
French:Procédé et éléments en couches pour la maitrise et le contrôle thermique du climat intérieur réglé par rapport aux corps[1999/22]
Examination procedure08.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/19]
24.09.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
22.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.10.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
08.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/03]
16.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
08.01.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2932628  (HAFERLAND FRIEDRICH PROF DR IN) [A] 1-35 * figures 1-23; claims 1-22 *;
 [A]DE7905382U  (REINHOLD, BRUNO) [A] 1-35 * figure 2; claims 1-4 *;
 [AD]EP0743494  (FINEL TRADING CO EST [LI]) [AD] 1-35 * abstract *;
 [A]DE2610370  (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG) [A] 1-35 * figures 1-13; claims 1-9 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.