EP0893055 - Fishing rod [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIWA SEIKO INC. No. 14-16, Maesawa 3-chome Higashikurume-shi Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | For all designated states DAIWA SEIKO INC. No. 14-16, Maesawa 3-chome Higashikurume-shi, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oda, Hiroshi 166-14, Fujima Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Kimura, Shuichi 3-12-2, Asahi-cho Akishima-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Arata, Hiroshi 2-4-6, Nakahara Musashimurayama-shi, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Ohta, Seiki 1-3-4, Nozawa, Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Komura, Yasuo 4-2-6-1B, Sengoku, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | [1999/04] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98120849.9 | 11.08.1995 | [1999/04] | Priority number, date | JP19940211874 | 12.08.1994 Original published format: JP 21187494 | JP19940238526 | 06.09.1994 Original published format: JP 23852694 | JP19950113773 | 14.04.1995 Original published format: JP 11377395 | [1999/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0893055 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0893055 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | [1999/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0893055 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A01K87/00 | [1999/04] | CPC: |
A01K87/002 (EP);
A01K87/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/04] | Title | German: | Angelrute | [1999/04] | English: | Fishing rod | [1999/04] | French: | Canne à pêche | [1999/04] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 22.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95112697.8 / EP0696421 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]FR2539582 (GARBOLINO SA ETS [FR]) [Y] 1,16 * the whole document * [A] 2,3; | [Y]GB2112612 (CENTRELINE RODS LIMITED) [Y] 1,16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3246801 (SCHRANKLER EDUARD, et al) [A] 6 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS62181728 ; | [A]GB1159069 (ANRE CARABASSE [FR]) [A] 17 * page 3, line 16 - line 24; figures 1,3 *; | [A]FR2064581 (VIGIER ROGER) [A] 17 * page 3, line 11 - line 21; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US1595275 (WHITE JOEL K); | [A]FR980938 (GOUDRON); | [A]US2541609 (FRANCIS PULLAN JAMES); | [A]US2282618 (STEWART WILLIAM H) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 37, Database accession no. 87-261273, XP002093778 & JPS62181728 A 19860810 (DAIWA SEIKO KK) [A] 13 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH0216626 |