Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.2005 [2005/12] |
13.02.2004 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] |
07.02.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
07.02.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
12.12.2003 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.09.2003 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
11.12.2002 | Renewal fee | |
13.08.2002 | Change - extension states | |
19.04.2002 | Definitive list of designations | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
05.04.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] |
11.12.2001 | Renewal fee | |
28.07.2001 | Publication of search report | published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] |
07.12.2000 | Renewal fee | |
02.07.1999 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.08.1999 [1999/33] |