Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0936415 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2004 | B1 | EP0936415 | 12.09.2001 | A3 | EP0936415 | 18.08.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19806115 | 14.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19806115 | 19.08.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19806115 | 14.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59811103D1 | 06.05.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19806115 | 14.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2218743T | 16.11.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19806115 | 14.02.1998 |