EP0933452 - Process for producing hydroxyapatite fibers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YABASHI INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. 188-1, Akasaka-cho Ogaki-shi Gifu-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states YABASHI INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. 188-1, Akasaka-cho Ogaki-shi Gifu-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ota, Yoshio 971-1, Arao-cho Ogaki-shi, Gifu-ken / JP | 02 /
Iwashita, Tetsushi 3-410-20, Aohaka-cho Ogaki-shi, Gifu-ken / JP | 03 /
Kasuga, Toshihiro, Q-3, Gurandomezon Odai 37 Kamishinmachi, Nishibiwajima-cho Nishikasugai-gun, Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Abe, Yoshihiro 6-1705, Higashiyama Nisshin-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Liedl, Christine, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | Liedl, Christine, Dipl.-Chem., et al Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98121008.1 | 05.11.1998 | [1999/31] | Priority number, date | JP19970320596 | 07.11.1997 Original published format: JP 32059697 | [1999/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0933452 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0933452 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | [1999/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0933452 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D01F9/08 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
C04B35/62268 (EP,US);
D01F9/08 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3208 (EP,US);
C04B2235/44 (EP,US);
C04B2235/442 (EP,US);
C04B2235/522 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/24] |
Former [1999/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Fasern aus Hydroxyapatit | [1999/31] | English: | Process for producing hydroxyapatite fibers | [1999/31] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de fibres d'hydroxyapatite | [1999/31] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 19.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPS53111000 [ ] (TOKYO IKA SHIKA DAIGAKUCHIYOU); | [A]JPH0252664 ; | [DA]JPH06172100 | [A] - AOKI, HIDEKI, "CaO-P2O5 Apatite", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 90:142180, URL: STN, XP002111503 [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 14, Database accession no. 90-102852, XP002111504 & JPH0252664 A 19900222 (TDK CORP) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940927), vol. 018, no. 511, Database accession no. (C - 1253), & JP06172100 A 19940621 (YOSHIHIRO ABE;OTHERS: 01) [DA] 1-9 * abstract * |