Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3360586B | Global Dossier | 24.12.2002 | B2 | JPH11155132 | 08.06.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP32159797 | 21.11.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0918436 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2012 | B1 | EP0918436 | 12.04.2000 | A3 | EP0918436 | 26.05.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP32159797 | 21.11.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6072531 | 06.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP32159797 | 21.11.1997 |